Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lothar Buchmann (from 1988-01-01) (until 1988-11-14) | 1936-08-15 | ||||
Horst Franz (from 1987-11-16) (until 1987-12-31) | 1940-06-17 | ||||
Peter Neururer (from 1987-09-15) (until 1987-11-16) | 1955-04-26 | ||||
Horst Hrubesch (until 1987-09-14) | 1951-04-17 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Rober (from 1987-11-01) (until 1991-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Kurth (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-03-15 | ||||
Christian Gebauer (until 1988-06-30) | 1968-08-27 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Willi Landgraf (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-08-29 | ||||
Dirk Pusch (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-01-30 | ||||
Oliver Koch (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-10-02 | ||||
Dieter Bast (until 1989-06-30) | 1951-08-28 | ||||
Frank Saborowski (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-03-14 | ||||
Peter Stichler (until 1988-12-31) | 1958-01-15 | ||||
Axel Noruschat (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-01-31 | ||||
Uwe Neuhaus (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-11-26 | ||||
Uwe Ptok (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-02-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1991-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Dirk Helmig (until 1990-12-31) | 1965-05-03 | ||||
Uwe Wegmann (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-01-14 | ||||
Detlef Laibach (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-11-25 | ||||
Manfred Maurer (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-03-27 | ||||
Hubert Schmitz (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-04-15 | ||||
Arthur Jeske (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-09-12 | ||||
Raschid Kartiou (until 1988-06-30) | 1968-12-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ralf Regenbogen (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-03-24 | ||||
Volker Abramczik (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-05-27 | ||||
Peter Ehlers (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-09-04 | ||||
Michael Propper (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-01-30 | ||||
Jorge Salomao (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-05-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1987-08-29 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |