Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jorg Berger (until 1988-12-31) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Michael Haas (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-12-15 | ||||
Klemens Hartenbach (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-06-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rolf Maier (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-04-11 | ||||
Udo Lay (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-03-13 | ||||
Martin Krieg (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-11-11 | ||||
Alfons Higl (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-12-17 | ||||
Klaus Bury (until 1989-06-30) | 1950-01-24 | ||||
Oliver Boiger (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-01-07 | ||||
Budimir Vujacic (until 1987-12-31) | 1964-01-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Karl-Heinz Schulz (until 1991-06-30) | 1955-12-21 | ||||
Thomas Schweizer (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-09-13 | ||||
Roland Bernhard (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-05-26 | ||||
Joachim Low (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-02-03 | ||||
Mustafa Kurt (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-03-17 | ||||
Jorg Jung (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-11-22 | ||||
Christian Streich (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-06-11 | ||||
Gunter Haslbeck (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-10-06 | ||||
Maximilian Hauck (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-08-20 | ||||
Armin Loffler (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-12-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Franz Weber (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-08-12 | ||||
Souleyman Sane (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-02-26 | ||||
Fred Schaub (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-08-28 | ||||
Andreas Kerber (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-05-20 | ||||
Peter Mohrle (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-10-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1987-08-29 15:30 |
1 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-10-24 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |