Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Toppmoller (from 1988-04-19) (until 1989-02-28) | 1951-08-12 | ||||
Werner Nickel (until 1988-04-18) | 1951-08-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Stirn (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-05-31 | ||||
Karsten Krannich (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-07-29 | ||||
Thomas Richter (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-02-27 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hannes Schuler (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
Thomas Schmidt (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-09-19 | ||||
Peter Assion (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-08-24 | ||||
Gunter Berti (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-07-31 | ||||
Rainer Heilmann (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-01-14 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Klaus Perfetto (from 1987-11-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-09-13 | ||||
Dieter Simon (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-07-25 | ||||
Andreas Zeyer (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-06-09 | ||||
Michael Zeyer (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-06-09 | ||||
Ulrich Bopple (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-03-22 | ||||
Marco della Schiava (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-07-25 | ||||
Erich Steer (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-11-28 | ||||
Lars Ellmerich (from 1988-01-01) (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-01-02 | ||||
Victor Lopes (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-09-10 | ||||
Dieter Kohnle (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-04-03 | ||||
Samuel Okwaraji (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-05-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Spies (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-07-08 | ||||
Hans-Peter Steck (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-01-12 | ||||
Achim Gluckler (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-08-10 | ||||
Waldemar Steubing (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-11-30 | ||||
Michael Deuerling (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-02-12 | ||||
Walter Hemmeter (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-07-16 | ||||
Werner Nickel (until 1988-06-30) | 1951-08-11 | ||||
Neven Rudic (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-04-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1987-08-29 15:30 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1987-09-15 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-10-24 15:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |