Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolf-Rudiger Krause (until 1988-06-30) | 1944-09-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Kirchhoff (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-07-03 | ||||
Waldemar Josef (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-10-25 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Geiger (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-09-27 | ||||
Uwe Otto (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-09-29 | ||||
Ralf Kammel (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-09-08 | ||||
Dirk Zehnpfund (until 1988-06-30) | |||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Heiner Pahl (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-02-27 | ||||
Olaf Ansorge (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-06-04 | ||||
Mathias Fiebich (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-11-08 | ||||
Uwe Beese (until 1989-06-30) | 1961-02-19 | ||||
Peter Ament (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-11-24 | ||||
Jurgen Mosert (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-07-09 | ||||
Lutz Hadrys (until 1989-06-30) | 1962 | ||||
Jorg Kretzschmar (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-12-09 | ||||
Werner Eichhorn (until 1988-06-30) | 1963 | ||||
Guido Gehrmann (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-09-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Holger Fiebich (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-05-21 | ||||
Frank Plagge (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Geoffrey Payne (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-02-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1987-08-29 15:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-11-21 14:00 |
4 : 5 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |