Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Kurt Geinzer (from 1988-05-01) (until 1989-04-13) | 1948-07-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Claus Reitmaier (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-03-17 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Peter Lohr (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-09-01 | ||||
Michael Sandt (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-12-16 | ||||
Andrzej Banasik (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-05-17 | ||||
Uwe Kramer (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-07-18 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Schmitt (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-09-30 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bernd Gramminger (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-07-08 | ||||
Hans-Peter Knecht (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-04-12 | ||||
Uwe Hofer (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-07-21 | ||||
Matthias Imhof (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-05-25 | ||||
Ingo Aulbach (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-08-05 | ||||
Michael Bachmann (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-09-30 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Markus Schafer (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-04-16 | ||||
Dieter Lindenau (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-03-09 | ||||
Boguslaw Skiba (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-11-16 | ||||
Peter Loontiens (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-09-16 | ||||
Josef Sarroca (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-08-12 | ||||
29 | Janis Hauser (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-07-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1987-08-29 15:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-10-24 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1988-02-13 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-03-09 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |