Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Otto Rehhagel (until 1995-06-30) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 2006-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Oliver Reck (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | ||||
Dieter Burdenski (until 1988-06-30) | 1950-11-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Rune Bratseth (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-03-19 | ||||
Uli Borowka (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-05-19 | ||||
Gunnar Sauer (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-06-11 | ||||
Jonny Otten (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-01-31 | ||||
Michael Kutzop (until 1990-06-30) | 1955-03-24 | ||||
Matthias Rulander (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-08-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dieter Eilts (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-12-13 | ||||
Thomas Wolter (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-10-04 | ||||
Gunter Hermann (until 1992-11-30) | 1960-12-05 | ||||
Mirko Votava (until 1992-06-30) | 1956-04-25 | ||||
Norbert Meier (until 1989-12-31) | 1958-09-20 | ||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 1987-10-04) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Neubarth (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-07-29 | ||||
Manfred Burgsmuller (until 1990-06-30) | 1949-12-22 | ||||
Christoph Hanses (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-10-06 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Riedle (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-09-16 | ||||
Frank Ordenewitz (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-03-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1987-08-28 19:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-11-21 14:00 |
4 : 5 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1988-02-13 14:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-02-24 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-03-09 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-04-13 20:15 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |