Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Grunther (from 1989-04-10) (until 1989-09-03) | 1951-02-11 | ||||
Peter Neururer (until 1989-04-10) | 1955-04-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Petteri Korkala (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-12-19 | ||||
Johannes Kau (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-04-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Goss (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-08 | ||||
Frank Schlutter (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-01-16 | ||||
Manfred Vigna (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-01-20 | ||||
Johannes Nelles (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-02-05 | ||||
Dietmar Schacht (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-09-28 | ||||
Peter Ritter (until 1988-12-31) | 1962-10-09 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Vlado Jelic (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-08-02 | ||||
Ralf Jorres (until 1992-06-30) | 1970-06-10 | ||||
Norbert Buschlinger (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-12-06 | ||||
Josef Zschau (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-01-07 | ||||
Bernd Zumbe (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-09-15 | ||||
Jorg Beyel (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-10-02 | ||||
Holger Gresens (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-10-03 | ||||
Hans-Peter Lipka (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-09-28 | ||||
Andreas Brandts (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-04-09 | ||||
Markus Hogner (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-04-26 | ||||
Jo Montanes (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-08-15 | ||||
Peter Sitek (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-04-03 | ||||
Erik Wagner (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-10-03 | ||||
Theo Gries (until 1988-10-24) | 1961-02-10 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Tim Gerhards (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-13 | ||||
Gunter Delzepich (until 1991-06-30) | 1958-03-21 | ||||
Egbert Zimmermann (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-02-19 | ||||
Leo Bunk (until 1989-12-31) | 1962-10-23 | ||||
Peter Sendscheid (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
Frank Weber (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-02-23 | ||||
Mario Krohm (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-06-02 | ||||
Kalle Del'Haye (until 1989-06-30) | 1955-08-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1988-08-06 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1988-09-24 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1988-12-10 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |