Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Helmut Schulte (until 1991-02-19) | 1957-09-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Seppo Eichkorn (until 1992-03-15) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Volker Ippig (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-01-28 | ||||
1 | Klaus Thomforde (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jan Kocian (until 1993-06-30) | 1958-03-13 | ||||
Bernhard Olck (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-10-23 | ||||
Andre Trulsen (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | ||||
Jens Duve (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-09-25 | ||||
Klaus Ulbricht (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-09-14 | ||||
Reinhard Kock (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-09-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Peter Knabel (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-10-02 | ||||
Klaus Ottens (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-01-04 | ||||
Michael Dahms (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-12-22 | ||||
Dirk Zander (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-05-13 | ||||
Morten-Fibak Jensen (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-07-13 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Bargfrede (until 1989-12-31) | 1959-03-10 | ||||
Egon Flad (until 1989-10-31) | 1964-03-05 | ||||
3 | Jurgen Gronau (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Andre Golke (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-08-15 | ||||
Jorn Grosskopf (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-08-29 | ||||
Waldemar Steubing (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-11-30 | ||||
Rudiger Wenzel (until 1990-06-30) | 1953-06-03 | ||||
Andre Bistram (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-03-25 | ||||
Kazuo Ozaki (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-03-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1988-08-05 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |