Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1989-09-01) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Agaciak (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-02-17 | ||||
Jacek Jarecki (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-06-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dirk Hupe (until 1994-06-30) | 1957-05-29 | ||||
Peter Ritter (from 1989-01-01) (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-10-09 | ||||
Dirk Hielscher (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-17 | ||||
Gunter Hutwelker (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-04-15 | ||||
Friedhelm Frenken (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-09-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Niggemann (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-01-04 | ||||
Peter Seufert (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-11-29 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Gede (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-14 | ||||
Ralf Aussem (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-09-01 | ||||
Stephan Engels (from 1989-01-01) (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-09-06 | ||||
Victor Lopes (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-09-10 | ||||
Dirk Rehbein (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-08-14 | ||||
Anthony Baffoe (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-05-25 | ||||
Christiaan Pfortner (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-03-03 | ||||
Michael Hagele (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-03-11 | ||||
Hartmund Pitten (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-05-21 | ||||
Norbert Richartz (until 1989-03-29) | 1969-01-25 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Matthias Hamann (from 1988-12-01) (until 1990-06-30) | 1968-02-10 | ||||
Tony Woodcock (until 1990-06-30) | 1955-12-06 | ||||
Uwe Fuchs (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-07-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1988-08-06 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1988-09-24 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1988-10-13 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1988-12-10 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |