Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Aleksandar Ristic (until 1990-12-15) | 1944-06-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Schmadtke (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-03-16 | ||||
Uwe Dignass (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-03-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ralf Loose (until 1993-12-31) | 1963-01-05 | ||||
Rudolf Wojtowicz (until 1993-06-30) | 1956-06-09 | ||||
Karl Werner (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-07-21 | ||||
Sven Backhaus (until 1990-06-30) | 1968-06-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andreas Kaiser (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-05-04 | ||||
Michael Schutz (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-12-12 | ||||
Mike Buskens (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-03-19 | ||||
Dirk Krumpelmann (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-08-22 | ||||
Jorg Spillmann (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-02-07 | ||||
Richard Walz (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-08-24 | ||||
Petr Rada (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-08-21 | ||||
Pavel Chaloupka (from 1989-01-01) (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-05-04 | ||||
Michael Kimmel (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-01-08 | ||||
Christian Heide (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-08-08 | ||||
Thomas Seeliger (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-09-20 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bernd Klotz (until 1991-06-30) | 1958-09-08 | ||||
Michael Preetz (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | ||||
Sven Demandt (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-02-13 | ||||
Peter Radojewski (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-11-18 | ||||
Nizar Trabelsi (until 1989-06-30) | 1970-07-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1988-08-06 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |