Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Saftig (from 1989-03-22) (until 1989-06-30) | 1952-01-23 | ||||
Hans Siemensmeyer (from 1988-09-19) (until 1989-03-21) | 1940-09-23 | ||||
Jurgen Wahling (until 1988-09-19) | 1940-12-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Nagel (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-11-07 | ||||
Ralf Raps (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-10-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Mathias Kuhlmey (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-02-28 | ||||
Axel Sundermann (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-01-23 | ||||
Karlheinz Geils (until 1990-06-30) | 1955-05-20 | ||||
Bastian Hellberg (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-27 | ||||
Michael Kopper (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-11-17 | ||||
Holger Willmer (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-09-25 | ||||
Thomas Zechel (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-01-25 | ||||
Peter Zanter (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-11-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Martin Groth (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-10-20 | ||||
Karsten Surmann (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-10-05 | ||||
Frank Pagelsdorf (from 1989-01-01) (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-02-05 | ||||
Bernd Dierssen (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-08-28 | ||||
Jurgen Prange (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-08-21 | ||||
Detlev Dammeier (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | ||||
Gunter Drews (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-07-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Siegfried Reich (until 1989-11-10) | 1959-09-29 | ||||
Stefan Kohn (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-10-09 | ||||
Gregor Grillemeier (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-02-17 | ||||
Dieter Schatzschneider (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-04-26 | ||||
Frank Hartmann (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-08-17 | ||||
Andreas Pallasch (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-07-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1988-08-06 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |