Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Detlef Pirsig (until 1989-06-30) | 1945-10-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Vos (until 1989-06-30) | 1939-01-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Kellermann (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-09-24 | ||||
Heribert Macherey (until 1992-06-30) | 1954-11-03 | ||||
Olaf Rusche (until 1989-06-30) | 1970-05-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Patrick Notthoff (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-02-26 | ||||
Michael Struckmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Oswald Semlits (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-06-07 | ||||
Jorg Kessen (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-09-07 | ||||
Michael Telljohann (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-03-09 | ||||
Ralf Zils (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-05-25 | ||||
Andreas Haremski (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-07-05 | ||||
Holger Bohlke (until 1989-06-30) | 1969-08-23 | ||||
Stefan Janssen (until 1989-06-30) | 1970-01-22 | ||||
Karl Rohr (until 1989-06-30) | 1954-07-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Toni Puszamszies (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-08-14 | ||||
Uwe Kober (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-04-24 | ||||
Mike Vossnacke (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-01-03 | ||||
Thomas Strunz (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-04-25 | ||||
Werner Malischke (until 1989-06-30) | 1961-12-07 | ||||
Thomas Vtic (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-09-02 | ||||
Drago Skipic (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
Ralf Kessen (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-09-07 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ewald Lienen (until 1992-06-30) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Michael Tonnies (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-12-19 | ||||
Rudi Decker (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-08-13 | ||||
Mario Canini (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-05-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1988-08-07 |
3 : 5 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |