Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd Roggensack (until 1989-06-30) | 1941-10-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Eilenberger (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-11-16 | ||||
Wolfgang Kellner (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-04-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Stefan Emmerling (from 1989-01-01) (until 1994-12-31) | 1966-02-10 | ||||
Jorg Bach (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-11-20 | ||||
Thomas Langbein (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-01-31 | ||||
Jorg Sobiech (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-01-15 | ||||
Thomas Siewert (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-11-04 | ||||
Martin Reimann (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-03-17 | ||||
Ralf Lewe (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-05-13 | ||||
Martin Kollenberg (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-06-13 | ||||
Frank Kontny (until 1989-11-30) | 1964-12-21 | ||||
Guido Sobiech (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-03-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eduard Buckmaier (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-06-09 | ||||
Dirk Kontny (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-11-30 | ||||
Harald Kugler (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-02-15 | ||||
Jochen Terhaar (until 1989-08-14) | 1961-12-06 | ||||
Pasi Rautiainen (until 1989-06-30) | 1961-07-18 | ||||
Christian Bittner (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-12-03 | ||||
Jurgen Borutta (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-03-08 | ||||
Marco Rothe (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-10-01 | ||||
Olaf Wasmuth (until 1989-06-30) | 1969-12-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Tschiskale (until 1993-09-30) | 1962-07-09 | ||||
Srdjan Jankovic (until 1990-12-31) | 1960-02-03 | ||||
Maurice Banach (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-10-09 | ||||
Heiko Ueding (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-10-04 | ||||
Dirk van der Ven (until 1989-06-30) | 1970-03-01 | ||||
Rainer Fromberg (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-03-26 | ||||
Frank Bast (until 1989-06-30) | 1969-09-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1988-08-05 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1988-08-16 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |