Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Persike (until 1991-06-30) | 1947-07-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Hermann Rulander (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-11-21 | ||||
Norbert Brinker (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-05-26 | ||||
Hubert Koopmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-02-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Faltin (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-11-22 | ||||
Bernd Deters (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-08-18 | ||||
Horst Bruns (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-10-23 | ||||
Paul Caligiuri (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-03-09 | ||||
Eckhard Vorholt (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-10-18 | ||||
Matthias Mirtelj (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-07-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Thomas Bottche (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-02-14 | ||||
Gerd Heuermann (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-12-26 | ||||
Frank Klobke (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-08-04 | ||||
Werner Rusche (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-04-03 | ||||
Torsten Abeln (until 1992-06-30) | 1970-09-29 | ||||
Helmut Rolfes (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-04-03 | ||||
Dietmar Sulmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-03-26 | ||||
Reinhold Tattermusch (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-04-11 | ||||
Marko Myyry (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-11-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Robert Thoben (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-11-17 | ||||
Josef Menke (until 1997-06-30) | 1959-09-03 | ||||
Martin van der Putten (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-10-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1988-08-07 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |