Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gunter Sebert (from 1988-11-17) (until 1991-09-14) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Felix Latzke (until 1988-11-16) | 1942-02-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gunter Sebert (until 1988-11-16) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Clauss (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-01-13 | ||||
Uwe Zimmermann (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | ||||
Valentin Herr (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-07-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Roland Dickgiesser (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Damir Buric (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-07-07 | ||||
Dimitrios Tsionanis (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-08-31 | ||||
Zvezdan Cvetkovic (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-04-18 | ||||
Manfred Bockenfeld (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-07-23 | ||||
Ulf Quaisser (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-10-12 | ||||
Dieter Finke (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-03-11 | ||||
Frank Ockert (until 1988-12-31) | 1968-11-08 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jochen Muller (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Lutz Siebrecht (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-10-26 | ||||
Thomas Franck (until 1990-06-30) | 1971-02-24 | ||||
Gunter Guttler (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-05-31 | ||||
Peter Lux (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-04 | ||||
Martin Trieb (until 1989-12-31) | 1961-09-23 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Freiler (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-05-02 | ||||
Gerd Dais (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-08-11 | ||||
Uwe Meyer (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-06-21 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Buhrer (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-10-20 | ||||
Frank Lippmann (until 1988-12-31) | 1961-04-23 | ||||
Dirk Kurtenbach (until 1988-11-30) | 1964-08-02 | ||||
Frank Schmoller (until 1988-09-15) | 1966-08-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1988-08-06 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1988-11-01 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1988-12-10 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |