Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (from 1990-04-10) (until 1990-06-30) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Hermann Gerland (until 1990-04-09) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (until 1990-04-09) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Kopke (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-03-12 | ||||
Kurt Kowarz (until 1994-06-30) | 1958-04-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jorg Dittwar (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-08-01 | ||||
Uwe Wolf (from 1989-10-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-10 | ||||
Ralf Dusend (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-09-28 | ||||
Uli Bayerschmidt (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-03-03 | ||||
Ulf Metschies (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-09-22 | ||||
Dieter Osswald (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-08-23 | ||||
Vlado Kasalo (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-11-11 | ||||
Stefan Kuhn (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-12-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marc Oechler (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-02-11 | ||||
Joachim Philipkowski (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-02-26 | ||||
Martin Wagner (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-02-24 | ||||
Thomas Brunner (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-08-10 | ||||
Gunter Drews (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-07-09 | ||||
Andreas Scholl (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-11-12 | ||||
Christian Hausmann (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-11-21 | ||||
Martin Schneider (until 1990-06-30) | 1968-11-24 | ||||
Aleksandar Abutovic (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-08-09 | ||||
Christian Korek (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-06-16 | ||||
Thomas Kristl (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Brunner (until 1989-12-31) | 1965-02-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Reiner Wirsching (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-01-18 | ||||
Frank Turr (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-09-16 | ||||
Thomas Klein (until 1990-12-31) | 1965-04-23 | ||||
Souleyman Sane (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-02-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1989-08-19 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-09-23 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |