Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jupp Heynckes (until 1991-10-08) | 1945-05-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Egon Coordes (until 1991-10-14) | 1944-07-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Raimond Aumann (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-10-12 | ||||
Sven Scheuer (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-01-19 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Roland Grahammer (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-11-03 | ||||
Hans Pflugler (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-03-27 | ||||
Jurgen Kohler (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-10-06 | ||||
Stefan Reuter (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-10-16 | ||||
Klaus Augenthaler (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-09-26 | ||||
Thomas Kastenmaier (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-05-31 | ||||
Erland Johnsen (until 1989-11-30) | 1967-04-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Olaf Thon (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-05-01 | ||||
Manfred Schwabl (until 1992-12-31) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Manfred Bender (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-05-24 | ||||
Thomas Strunz (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-04-25 | ||||
Hans Dorfner (until 1990-12-31) | 1965-07-03 | ||||
Ludwig Kogl (until 1990-08-04) | 1966-03-07 | ||||
Hansi Flick (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-02-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Roland Wohlfarth (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-01-11 | ||||
Alan McInally (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-02-10 | ||||
Radmilo Mihajlovic (until 1990-12-31) | 1964-11-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1989-08-19 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-09-23 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1989-11-09 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |