Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Reinders (until 1990-06-30) | 1955-01-19 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1991-06-30) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Rainer Zobel (until 1990-06-30) | 1948-11-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Mathias Hain (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-12-31 | ||||
Oliver Lerch (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-08 | ||||
Uwe Hain (until 1992-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ulf-Volker Probst (from 1989-12-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-10-03 | ||||
Bernd Gorski (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-10-04 | ||||
Michael Scheike (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-09-11 | ||||
Thomas Schmidt (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-09-19 | ||||
Ronald Lotz (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-09-21 | ||||
Dirk Lellek (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-01-03 | ||||
Thomas Thumerer (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-07-23 | ||||
Michael Wilke (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-05-30 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tino Lochelt (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-08-13 | ||||
Heinz-Gunter Scheil (until 1993-01-30) | 1962-11-09 | ||||
Stefan Holze (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-05-14 | ||||
Thomas Seeliger (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-09-20 | ||||
Jacek Frackiewicz (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-09-19 | ||||
Olaf Rose (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-10-28 | ||||
Guido Naumann (until 1990-12-31) | 1968-04-14 | ||||
Sandor Steidl (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-09-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bernd Buchheister (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-09-21 | ||||
Holger Aden (from 1990-01-01) (until 1992-12-09) | 1965-08-25 | ||||
Andreas Pospich (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-12-08 | ||||
Werner Dressel (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-08-30 | ||||
Dirk Holdorf (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-09-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1989-08-18 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-09-23 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-11-11 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1989-12-13 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1990-03-27 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |