Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Franz-Josef Tenhagen (from 1989-10-03) (until 1990-09-23) | 1952-10-31 | ||||
Jean Loring (from 1989-09-02) (until 1989-10-02) | 1934-08-16 | ||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1989-09-01) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Agaciak (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-02-17 | ||||
Jacek Jarecki (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-06-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dirk Hupe (until 1994-06-30) | 1957-05-29 | ||||
Peter Ritter (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-10-09 | ||||
Dirk Hielscher (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-17 | ||||
Thomas Agaciak (until 1990-06-30) | 1970-04-12 | ||||
Gunter Hutwelker (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-04-15 | ||||
Pawel Krol (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-10-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Niggemann (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-01-04 | ||||
Dirk Lottner (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-03-04 | ||||
Andreas Brandts (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-04-09 | ||||
Martin Luhr (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-11-01 | ||||
Peter Seufert (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-11-29 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Gede (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-14 | ||||
Ralf Aussem (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-09-01 | ||||
Stephan Engels (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-09-06 | ||||
Victor Lopes (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-09-10 | ||||
Dirk Rehbein (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-08-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wiktor Pasulko (from 1990-01-01) (until 1993-03-30) | 1961-01-01 | ||||
Holger Friz (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-04-26 | ||||
Thorsten Bolzek (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-07-07 | ||||
Matthias Hamann (until 1990-06-30) | 1968-02-10 | ||||
Tony Woodcock (until 1990-06-30) | 1955-12-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1989-08-19 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |