Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Wohlers (until 1990-11-25) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Rainer Bonhof (until 1990-06-30) | 1952-03-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Siegfried Gruninger (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-06-28 | ||||
Manfred Kubik (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-02-25 | ||||
Andre Lenz (until 1990-06-30) | 1973-11-19 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Stephan Passlack (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-08-24 | ||||
Torsten Chmielewski (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-01-21 | ||||
Wolfgang Funkel (until 1991-06-30) | 1958-08-10 | ||||
Rainer Zietsch (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-11-21 | ||||
Gerhard Kleppinger (until 1991-06-30) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Holger Fach (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-09-06 | ||||
Dietmar Klinger (until 1991-06-30) | 1958-01-08 | ||||
Marco Titgens (until 1990-06-30) | 1970-06-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marcel Witeczek (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | ||||
Horst Steffen (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-03-03 | ||||
Werner Kempkens (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-11-03 | ||||
Jan Bartram (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-03-06 | ||||
Thomas Stickroth (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-04-13 | ||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 1990-06-30) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Reinhold Mathy (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-04-12 | ||||
Manfred Hellmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-08-16 | ||||
Darius Scholtysik (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-08-04 | ||||
Christian Dondera (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-01-25 | ||||
Thorsten Fallack (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-09-28 | ||||
Stefan Jorissen (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-10-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Siegfried Reich (from 1989-11-11) (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-09-29 | ||||
Michael Klauss (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-09-15 | ||||
Stefan Trienekens (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-08-21 | ||||
Brian Laudrup (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-02-22 | ||||
Stephan Wolff (until 1990-06-30) | 1970-01-29 | ||||
Jan Schroers (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-10-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1989-08-18 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |