Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Kurt Geinzer (from 1990-04-16) (until 1992-06-30) | 1948-07-03 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Neues (from 1989-12-16) (until 1990-04-15) | 1950-11-14 | ||||
Niko Semlitsch (until 1989-12-15) | 1946-11-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernd Fuhr (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-04-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Stefan Schummer (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-08-14 | ||||
Michael Kostner (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-02-07 | ||||
Achim Thiel (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-16 | ||||
Karl Richter (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-03-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gunther Albert (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-11-14 | ||||
Christos Figas (until 1993-12-31) | 1969-11-16 | ||||
Peter Cyrys (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-03-17 | ||||
Ronny Borchers (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-08-10 | ||||
Michael Kroninger (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-12-12 | ||||
Knut Hahn (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-12-19 | ||||
Mirza Kapetanovic (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-06-30 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
David Behlil (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-06-08 | ||||
Axel Brummer (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-11-25 | ||||
Hans Richter (from 1989-10-01) (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-09-14 | ||||
Ralf Haub (from 1990-01-01) (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-07-26 | ||||
Guido Erhard (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-10-06 | ||||
Uwe Igler (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-11-14 | ||||
Senad Merdanovic (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1989-08-18 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-09-23 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1989-11-10 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1990-02-17 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1990-03-13 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1990-03-28 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |