Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willibert Kremer (until 1992-04-20) | 1939-10-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Kellermann (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-09-24 | ||||
Heribert Macherey (until 1992-06-30) | 1954-11-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Patrick Notthoff (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-02-26 | ||||
Michael Struckmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Massimo Mariotti (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-11-22 | ||||
Lothar Woelk (until 1992-06-30) | 1954-08-03 | ||||
Marco Koller (from 1990-01-01) (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-06-25 | ||||
Oswald Semlits (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-06-07 | ||||
Jorg Kessen (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-09-07 | ||||
Michael Telljohann (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-03-09 | ||||
Ralf Zils (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-05-25 | ||||
2 | Joachim Hopp (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-07-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Franz-Josef Steininger (until 1996-06-30) | 1960-07-09 | ||||
Rachid Azzouzi (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-01-10 | ||||
Toni Puszamszies (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-08-14 | ||||
Uwe Kober (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-04-24 | ||||
Pietro Callea (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-09-04 | ||||
Kemal Alispahic (from 1989-11-01) (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-03-13 | ||||
Mike Vossnacke (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-01-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ferenc Schmidt (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-07-28 | ||||
Ewald Lienen (until 1992-06-30) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Michael Tonnies (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-12-19 | ||||
Gyula Hajszan (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-10-09 | ||||
Gunter Thiele (until 1990-12-31) | 1961-11-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1989-08-19 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-09-23 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-11-11 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1990-02-17 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1990-03-13 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |