Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans-Werner Moors (until 1991-06-30) | 1950-07-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1991-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Kurth (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-03-15 | ||||
Wolfgang Wiesner (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-02-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Kontny (from 1989-12-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-12-21 | ||||
Frank Thommessen (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-05-31 | ||||
Willi Landgraf (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-08-29 | ||||
Dirk Pusch (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-01-30 | ||||
Jorg Strube (until 1991-06-30) | 1971-02-21 | ||||
Oliver Koch (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-10-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Stefan Chmielewski (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-01-21 | ||||
Jurgen Serr (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-05-21 | ||||
Mario Basler (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-12-18 | ||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1991-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Carsten Rafoth (until 1991-06-30) | 1971-07-01 | ||||
Burkhard Steiner (until 1991-06-30) | 1958-10-04 | ||||
Dirk Wissel (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-03-26 | ||||
Dirk Helmig (until 1990-12-31) | 1965-05-03 | ||||
Fabrizio Hayer (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-05-11 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ralf Regenbogen (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-03-24 | ||||
Marek Koniarek (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-05-29 | ||||
Volker Abramczik (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-05-27 | ||||
Aaron Biagioli (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-01-26 | ||||
Manfred Ostendorf (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-08-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1989-08-19 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |