Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Zobel (from 1990-05-02) (until 1992-06-30) | 1948-11-03 | ||||
Manfred Krafft (until 1990-05-01) | 1937-12-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Stefan Brasas (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-08-31 | ||||
Kari Laukkanen (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-12-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Keim (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-06-08 | ||||
Wolfgang Wolf (until 1992-06-30) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Heribert Stadler (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-01-04 | ||||
Alfred Schon (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-01-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Matthias Imhof (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-05-25 | ||||
Alois Schwartz (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-03-28 | ||||
Reinhold Tattermusch (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-04-11 | ||||
Dirk Fengler (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-03-03 | ||||
Andreas Bross (until 1991-06-30) | 1971-02-28 | ||||
Oliver Straube (until 1990-06-30) | 1971-12-13 | ||||
Wolfgang Schuler (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-02-17 | ||||
Bernd Grabosch (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-09-23 | ||||
Runald Ossen (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-05-18 | ||||
Gianni Coveli (until 1990-06-30) | 1970-07-31 | ||||
Peter Starzmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-07-27 | ||||
Ralf Rueff (until 1990-06-30) | 1968-06-30 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gregor Grillemeier (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-02-17 | ||||
Ralf Vollmer (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-07-05 | ||||
Fredi Bobic (until 1990-06-30) | 1971-10-30 | ||||
Leo Bunk (from 1990-01-01) (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-23 | ||||
Ari Hjelm (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-02-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1989-08-19 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-09-23 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |