Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Persike (until 1991-06-30) | 1947-07-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Hermann Rulander (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-11-21 | ||||
Norbert Brinker (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-05-26 | ||||
Hubert Koopmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-02-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Faltin (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-11-22 | ||||
Bernd Deters (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-08-18 | ||||
Horst Bruns (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-10-23 | ||||
Paul Caligiuri (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-03-09 | ||||
Eckhard Vorholt (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-10-18 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Manfred Schulte (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-09-26 | ||||
Thomas Bottche (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-02-14 | ||||
Bogdan Dlugajczyk (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-05-03 | ||||
Gerd Heuermann (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-12-26 | ||||
Frank Klobke (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-08-04 | ||||
Werner Rusche (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-04-03 | ||||
Torsten Abeln (until 1992-06-30) | 1970-09-29 | ||||
Helmut Rolfes (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-04-03 | ||||
Jorg Kretzschmar (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-12-09 | ||||
Dietmar Sulmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-03-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Robert Thoben (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-11-17 | ||||
Josef Menke (until 1997-06-30) | 1959-09-03 | ||||
Martin van der Putten (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-10-27 | ||||
Leszek Kosowski (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-07-12 | ||||
Andreas Polenski (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-06-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1989-08-19 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |