Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gunter Sebert (until 1991-09-14) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Valentin Herr (until 1991-09-13) | 1957-07-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Clauss (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-01-13 | ||||
Uwe Zimmermann (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Fellhauer (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-09-16 | ||||
Roland Dickgiesser (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Bernd Schindler (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-12-28 | ||||
Christian Worns (until 1991-06-30) | 1972-05-10 | ||||
Damir Buric (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-07-07 | ||||
Dimitrios Tsionanis (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-08-31 | ||||
Thomas Zechel (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-01-25 | ||||
Zvezdan Cvetkovic (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-04-18 | ||||
Klaus Dalmus (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-12-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jochen Muller (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Lutz Siebrecht (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-10-26 | ||||
Andreas Lassig (until 1991-06-30) | 1971-11-10 | ||||
Frank Haun (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-08-31 | ||||
Thomas Franck (until 1990-06-30) | 1971-02-24 | ||||
Gunter Guttler (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-05-31 | ||||
Peter Lux (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-04 | ||||
Thomas Gronbach (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-08-10 | ||||
Markus Worner (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-02-01 | ||||
Martin Trieb (until 1989-12-31) | 1961-09-23 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Freiler (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-05-02 | ||||
Gerd Dais (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-08-11 | ||||
Uwe Meyer (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-06-21 | ||||
Volker Rudel (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-11-27 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Buhrer (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-10-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1989-08-18 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-09-23 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |