Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Koppel (until 1991-06-30) | 1948-05-17 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Henke (until 1998-06-30) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Lothar Huber (until 1992-06-30) | 1952-05-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang de Beer (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Stefan Klos (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-08-16 | ||||
Rolf Meyer (until 1991-06-30) | 1955-10-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Schulz (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-09-03 | ||||
Uwe Grauer (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-01-01 | ||||
Steffen Karl (until 1993-12-31) | 1970-02-03 | ||||
Gunter Kutowski (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-08-02 | ||||
Peter Quallo (until 1992-06-30) | 1971-10-02 | ||||
Thomas Helmer (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-04-21 | ||||
Sergej Gorlukowitsch (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-11-18 | ||||
Robert Nikolic (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-08-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerhard Poschner (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-23 | ||||
Michael Rummenigge (until 1993-09-14) | 1964-02-03 | ||||
Michael Lusch (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-06-16 | ||||
Tim Gutberlet (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-08-23 | ||||
Michael Zorc (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | ||||
Thomas Franck (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-02-24 | ||||
Dirk Hofmann (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-06-06 | ||||
Gunter Breitzke (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-06-29 | ||||
Stefan Strerath (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-01-15 | ||||
Mario Plechaty (until 1991-06-30) | 1971-02-18 | ||||
Murdo MacLeod (until 1990-10-10) | 1958-09-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Flemming Povlsen (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-12-03 | ||||
Frank Mill (until 1994-06-30) | 1958-07-23 | ||||
Jurgen Wegmann (until 1992-12-31) | 1964-03-31 | ||||
Martin Driller (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-01-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1990-08-04 15:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |