Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Fuchs (from 1991-03-29) (until 1992-10-14) | 1948-10-25 | ||||
Joachim Streich (until 1991-03-28) | 1951-04-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1991-06-30) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Mathias Hain (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-12-31 | ||||
Oliver Lerch (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-08 | ||||
Uwe Hain (until 1992-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ulf-Volker Probst (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-10-03 | ||||
Dirk Schuster (until 1991-07-31) | 1967-12-29 | ||||
Bernd Gorski (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-10-04 | ||||
Michael Scheike (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-09-11 | ||||
Thomas Schmidt (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-09-19 | ||||
Ronald Lotz (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-09-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tino Lochelt (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-08-13 | ||||
Ralf Geilenkirchen (from 1990-11-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-04-26 | ||||
Peter Lux (from 1990-11-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-10-04 | ||||
Heinz-Gunter Scheil (until 1993-01-30) | 1962-11-09 | ||||
Carsten Alrutz (until 1992-06-30) | 1972-03-04 | ||||
Stefan Holze (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-05-14 | ||||
Thomas Seeliger (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-09-20 | ||||
Jacek Frackiewicz (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-09-19 | ||||
Olaf Rose (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-10-28 | ||||
Meik Tischler (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-02-27 | ||||
Guido Naumann (until 1990-12-31) | 1968-04-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Igor Belanow (from 1991-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-09-25 | ||||
Stefan Meissner (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-03-08 | ||||
Bernd Buchheister (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-09-21 | ||||
Holger Aden (until 1992-12-09) | 1965-08-25 | ||||
Andreas Pospich (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-12-08 | ||||
Jameleddine Limam (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-06-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1990-08-04 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1990-11-03 15:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |