Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Wohlers (from 1991-02-19) (until 1992-03-15) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Helmut Schulte (until 1991-02-19) | 1957-09-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Seppo Eichkorn (until 1992-03-15) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Volker Ippig (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-01-28 | ||||
Jan Wessel (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-06-24 | ||||
1 | Klaus Thomforde (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jan Kocian (until 1993-06-30) | 1958-03-13 | ||||
Bernhard Olck (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-10-23 | ||||
Andre Trulsen (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | ||||
Jens Duve (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-09-25 | ||||
Klaus Ulbricht (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-09-14 | ||||
4 | Dieter Schlindwein (until 1997-06-30) | 1961-02-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bernd Hollerbach (from 1991-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-12-08 | ||||
Peter Knabel (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-10-02 | ||||
Ralf Sievers (from 1990-09-03) (until 1993-06-30) | 1961-10-30 | ||||
Klaus Ottens (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-01-04 | ||||
Michael Dahms (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-12-22 | ||||
Dirk Zander (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-05-13 | ||||
Frank Wolf (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-05-09 | ||||
Morten-Fibak Jensen (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-07-13 | ||||
3 | Jurgen Gronau (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | |||
5 | Dirk Dammann (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ivo Knoflicek (until 1991-10-10) | 1962-02-23 | ||||
Andre Golke (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-08-15 | ||||
Jorn Grosskopf (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-08-29 | ||||
Waldemar Steubing (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-11-30 | ||||
16 | Leonardo Manzi (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-04-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1990-08-04 15:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1990-11-02 20:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |