Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Zobel (until 1992-06-30) | 1948-11-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Stefan Brasas (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-08-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jochen Novodomsky (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-04-04 | ||||
Andreas Keim (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-06-08 | ||||
Wolfgang Wolf (until 1992-06-30) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Thomas Ritter (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-10-10 | ||||
Oliver Dittberner (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | ||||
Heribert Stadler (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-01-04 | ||||
Hubertus Becker (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-09-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Matthias Imhof (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-05-25 | ||||
Alois Schwartz (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-03-28 | ||||
Reinhold Tattermusch (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-04-11 | ||||
Marc Arnold (until 1992-06-30) | 1970-09-19 | ||||
Markus Baurle (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-10-15 | ||||
Dirk Fengler (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-03-03 | ||||
Thomas Winter (from 1991-01-01) (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-09-22 | ||||
Andreas Bross (until 1991-06-30) | 1971-02-28 | ||||
Dragan Terzic (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-08-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Marcus Marin (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-12-13 | ||||
Juan Cayasso (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-06-24 | ||||
Dimitrios Moutas (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-04-15 | ||||
Gregor Grillemeier (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-02-17 | ||||
Ralf Vollmer (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-07-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1990-08-04 15:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1990-11-04 14:15 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |