Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Sparwasser (until 1991-11-05) | 1948-06-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Tom Eilers (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-03-17 | ||||
Wilhelm Huxhorn (until 1993-06-30) | 1955-09-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Yvo Hoffmann (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-07-02 | ||||
Freddy Hess (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-03-07 | ||||
Rainer Scholz (until 1992-06-30) | 1954-09-03 | ||||
Ulf Schott (until 1992-06-30) | 1970-05-05 | ||||
Roger Prinzen (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-03-04 | ||||
Markus Sittardt (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-10-17 | ||||
Leo Caic (until 1990-09-30) | 1969-12-31 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Martin Kowalewski (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-06-09 | ||||
Stephan Tauber (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-10-08 | ||||
Jurgen Baier (until 1993-06-30) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Dirk Bakalorz (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-08-22 | ||||
Rafael Sanchez (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-06-23 | ||||
Guangming Gu (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-01-31 | ||||
Michael Blattel (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-09-29 | ||||
Christian Heide (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-08-08 | ||||
Sven Harter (until 1991-06-30) | 1971-10-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Henrik Eichenauer (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-07-07 | ||||
Dieter Gutzler (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-07-28 | ||||
Thomas Weiss (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-08-12 | ||||
Holger Wolf (until 1992-06-30) | 1973-02-19 | ||||
Thomas Kloss (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-03-26 | ||||
Tomas Kriz (until 1990-12-31) | 1959-03-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1990-08-04 15:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |