Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Schafstall (from 1991-04-22) (until 1991-06-30) | 1937-02-22 | ||||
Reinhard Saftig (until 1991-04-22) | 1952-01-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 1995-06-30) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Andreas Wessels (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-07-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rob Reekers (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Olaf Dressel (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-09-19 | ||||
Thomas Kempe (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-03-17 | ||||
Peter Zanter (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-11-11 | ||||
Patrick Guillou (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-04-16 | ||||
Walter Oswald (until 1991-06-30) | 1955-10-08 | ||||
Andreas Ridder (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-09-27 | ||||
12 | Christian Herrmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-01-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Wegmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-01-14 | ||||
Frank Heinemann (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-01-08 | ||||
Dirk Helmig (from 1991-01-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-05-03 | ||||
Frank Benatelli (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-08-19 | ||||
Michael Rzehaczek (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-01-17 | ||||
Thorsten Legat (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-11-07 | ||||
Elard Ostermann (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-10-15 | ||||
Laszlo Farkashazy (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-01-27 | ||||
Michael Hubner (until 1990-12-31) | 1969-08-12 | ||||
6 | Peter Peschel (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Rocco Milde (until 1993-11-30) | 1969-06-08 | ||||
Thomas Epp (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-04-07 | ||||
Jupp Nehl (until 1991-09-30) | 1961-06-13 | ||||
Stefan Kohn (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-10-09 | ||||
Uwe Leifeld (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-07-24 | ||||
Adam Woitynek (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-03-30 | ||||
Maciej Sliwowski (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-01-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1990-08-05 18:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |