Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Grunther (from 1990-10-23) (until 1991-08-19) | 1951-02-11 | ||||
Roland Koch (until 1990-10-22) | 1952-10-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Christof Rekers (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-25 | ||||
Wolfgang Kellner (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-04-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Mirko Baschetti (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-12-02 | ||||
Dirk Gellrich (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Dirk Lellek (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-01-03 | ||||
Jean-Pierre de Keyser (from 1991-01-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-04-13 | ||||
Oswald Semlits (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-06-07 | ||||
Ralf Voigt (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-12-31 | ||||
Branko Zeravica (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-01-18 | ||||
Paul Jaschke (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Schutte (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-01-24 | ||||
Holger Karp (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-03-26 | ||||
Igor Bulanow (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-11-15 | ||||
Ronald Maul (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-02-13 | ||||
Claus-Dieter Wollitz (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-07-19 | ||||
Carsten Marquardt (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-06-02 | ||||
Ralf Heskamp (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Heino van den Berg (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-12-07 | ||||
Roland Twyrdy (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-08-21 | ||||
Ansgar Brinkmann (until 1990-12-31) | 1969-07-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Fred Klaus (from 1991-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-02-27 | ||||
Uwe Igler (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-11-14 | ||||
Holger Kuhnel (until 1991-12-31) | 1969-02-21 | ||||
Uwe Jursch (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-06-20 | ||||
Christian Neidhart (until 1990-12-31) | 1968-10-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1990-08-04 15:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1990-11-04 15:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |