Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willi Entenmann (until 1993-11-09) | 1943-09-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Kopke (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-03-12 | ||||
Kurt Kowarz (until 1994-06-30) | 1958-04-12 | ||||
Stefan Crisan (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-01-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rainer Zietsch (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-11-21 | ||||
Kay Friedmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-05-15 | ||||
Marco Kurz (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-05-16 | ||||
Jorg Dittwar (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-08-01 | ||||
Uwe Wolf (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-10 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Heidenreich (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans Dorfner (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-07-03 | ||||
Marc Oechler (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-02-11 | ||||
Markus Baurle (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-10-15 | ||||
Dirk Fengler (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-03-03 | ||||
Joachim Philipkowski (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-02-26 | ||||
Martin Wagner (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-02-24 | ||||
Thomas Brunner (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-08-10 | ||||
Gunter Drews (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-07-09 | ||||
Andreas Scholl (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-11-12 | ||||
Uwe Weidemann (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-06-14 | ||||
Steffen Binke (until 1992-06-30) | 1972-09-07 | ||||
Andre Golke (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-08-15 | ||||
Michael Butrej (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-06-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Christian Wuck (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-06-09 | ||||
Dieter Eckstein (until 1993-09-05) | 1964-03-12 | ||||
Reiner Wirsching (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-01-18 | ||||
Sergio Zarate (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-01-14 | ||||
Jens Krinke (until 1992-06-30) | 1972-01-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1991-08-17 15:30 |
4 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |