Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Neururer (until 1993-06-30) | 1955-04-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Stephan Straub (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-01-25 | ||||
Marco Kostmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-04-12 | ||||
Alfred Wahlen (until 1993-06-30) | 1958-11-15 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernd Eichmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-02-12 | ||||
Mathias Honerbach (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-04-13 | ||||
Wenanty Fuhl (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-12-02 | ||||
Michael Kostner (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-02-07 | ||||
Eugen Hach (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-09-19 | ||||
Michael Nushohr (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-08-14 | ||||
Nasko Jelew (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-01-09 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jorg Reeb (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-01-06 | ||||
Thomas Zechel (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-01-25 | ||||
Jurgen Lange (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-01-08 | ||||
Jorg Roth (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-10-29 | ||||
Thomas Kristl (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Wolfgang Schuler (until 1993-06-30) | 1958-02-17 | ||||
Christiaan Pfortner (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-03-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bernd Rohrbacher (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-09-15 | ||||
Michael Kratzer (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-03-12 | ||||
Michael Preetz (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | ||||
Jonathan Akpoborie (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-10-20 | ||||
Heikko Glode (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-07-12 | ||||
Brian Skaarup (from 1992-01-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1972-08-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1991-07-28 15:00 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1991-08-18 15:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |