Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Saftig (until 1993-05-04) | 1952-01-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Hermann (until 1996-04-27) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rudiger Vollborn (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
23 | Dirk Heinen (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-12-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Franco Foda (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Martin Kree (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-01-27 | ||||
Stephan Hanke (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-10-19 | ||||
Jurgen Radschuweit (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-12-04 | ||||
Jorginho (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-08-17 | ||||
Erich Seckler (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-09-26 | ||||
Alois Reinhardt (until 1991-08-31) | 1961-11-18 | ||||
3 | Markus Happe (until 1999-12-05) | 1972-02-11 | |||
4 | Christian Worns (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-05-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Rene Rydlewicz (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-07-18 | ||||
Andreas Fischer (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-10-20 | ||||
Markus von Ahlen (until 1993-12-31) | 1971-01-01 | ||||
Matthias Stammann (until 1993-10-31) | 1968-05-08 | ||||
Andrzej Buncol (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-09-21 | ||||
5 | Ioan Lupescu (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-12-09 | |||
30 | Jupp Nehl (from 1991-10-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1961-06-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Andreas Thom (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-09-07 | ||||
Heiko Herrlich (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-12-03 | ||||
Marcus Feinbier (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-11-30 | ||||
Marek Lesniak (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-02-29 | ||||
Marko Schroder (until 1991-12-31) | 1966-05-18 | ||||
9 | Ulf Kirsten (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-12-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1991-08-18 16:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1991-09-03 20:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1991-09-24 17:00 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1991-10-30 20:00 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1992-04-07 20:00 |
2 : 0 PSO |
Schema Compare |