Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erich Ribbeck (from 1992-03-12) (until 1993-12-27) | 1937-06-13 | ||||
Soren Lerby (from 1991-10-09) (until 1992-03-11) | 1958-02-01 | ||||
Jupp Heynckes (until 1991-10-08) | 1945-05-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hermann Gerland (from 1991-10-09) (until 1992-06-30) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Egon Coordes (until 1991-10-14) | 1944-07-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Gospodarek (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-08-06 | ||||
Raimond Aumann (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-10-12 | ||||
Sven Scheuer (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-01-19 | ||||
Toni Schumacher (until 1992-06-30) | 1954-03-06 | ||||
Gerald Hillringhaus (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-06-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Markus Munch (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-09-07 | ||||
Alois Reinhardt (from 1991-09-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-11-18 | ||||
Roland Grahammer (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-11-03 | ||||
Thomas Berthold (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-11-12 | ||||
Oliver Kreuzer (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-11-13 | ||||
Max Eberl (until 1992-06-30) | 1973-09-21 | ||||
Markus Babbel (until 1992-06-30) | 1972-09-08 | ||||
Hans Pflugler (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-03-27 | ||||
Ulf Kliche (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-08-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Sternkopf (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-04-21 | ||||
Christian Ziege (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-02-01 | ||||
Jan Wouters (from 1991-11-23) (until 1993-12-31) | 1960-07-17 | ||||
Olaf Thon (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-05-01 | ||||
Manfred Schwabl (until 1992-12-31) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Stefan Effenberg (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-08-02 | ||||
Manfred Bender (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-05-24 | ||||
Thomas Strunz (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-04-25 | ||||
Bernardo (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-04-20 | ||||
Kurt Kremm (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-11-06 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bruno Labbadia (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Mazinho (until 1993-12-31) | 1965-12-26 | ||||
Roland Wohlfarth (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-01-11 | ||||
Brian Laudrup (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-02-22 | ||||
Alan McInally (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-02-10 | ||||
Thorsten Ott (until 1992-06-30) | 1973-06-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1991-08-17 15:30 |
2 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |