Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Fuchs (until 1992-10-14) | 1948-10-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Mathias Hain (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-12-31 | ||||
Oliver Lerch (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-08 | ||||
Uwe Hain (until 1992-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ulf-Volker Probst (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-10-03 | ||||
Ulf Metschies (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-09-22 | ||||
Michael Kopper (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-11-17 | ||||
Michael Koritzer (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-09-13 | ||||
Ali Muhamed Mahjoubi (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-12-28 | ||||
Ralf Strogies (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-09-18 | ||||
Michael Herberg (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-06-08 | ||||
Sven Scholze (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-08-30 | ||||
Dirk Schuster (until 1991-07-31) | 1967-12-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tino Lochelt (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-08-13 | ||||
Ralf Geilenkirchen (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-04-26 | ||||
Peter Lux (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-10-04 | ||||
Heinz-Gunter Scheil (until 1993-01-30) | 1962-11-09 | ||||
Carsten Alrutz (until 1992-06-30) | 1972-03-04 | ||||
Stefan Holze (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-05-14 | ||||
Mohamad Azim (until 1992-06-30) | |||||
Sturm | |||||
Igor Belanow (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-09-25 | ||||
Stefan Meissner (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-03-08 | ||||
Bernd Buchheister (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-09-21 | ||||
Holger Aden (until 1992-12-09) | 1965-08-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1991-07-28 15:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |