Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Seppo Eichkorn (from 1992-03-16) (until 1992-06-30) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Horst Wohlers (until 1992-03-15) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Seppo Eichkorn (until 1992-03-15) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Volker Ippig (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-01-28 | ||||
1 | Klaus Thomforde (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Robert Nikolic (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-08-01 | ||||
Jan Kocian (until 1993-06-30) | 1958-03-13 | ||||
Bernhard Olck (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-10-23 | ||||
Steffen Menze (from 1992-01-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-01-28 | ||||
4 | Dieter Schlindwein (until 1997-06-30) | 1961-02-07 | |||
6 | Torsten Frohling (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-08-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bernd Hollerbach (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-12-08 | ||||
Martino Gatti (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-10-23 | ||||
Thomas Goch (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-10-04 | ||||
Peter Knabel (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-10-02 | ||||
Ralf Sievers (until 1993-06-30) | 1961-10-30 | ||||
Klaus Ottens (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-01-04 | ||||
Frank Wolf (from 1992-01-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-05-09 | ||||
Gustavo Acosta (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-11-22 | ||||
Achim Grun (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-01-03 | ||||
3 | Jurgen Gronau (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | |||
5 | Dirk Dammann (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Michael Klauss (from 1991-10-06) (until 1992-06-30) | 1970-09-15 | ||||
Markus Sailer (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-04-26 | ||||
Ivo Knoflicek (until 1991-10-10) | 1962-02-23 | ||||
16 | Leonardo Manzi (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-04-28 | |||
20 | Martin Driller (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-01-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1991-07-27 15:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1991-08-17 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |