Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Egon Coordes (from 1992-03-12) (until 1992-09-21) | 1944-07-13 | ||||
Gerd-Volker Schock (until 1992-03-10) | 1950-04-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Nils Bahr (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-12-16 | ||||
Andreas Reinke (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-01-10 | ||||
1 | Richard Golz (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-06-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Rohde (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-03-02 | ||||
Thomas Stratos (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-10-09 | ||||
Dietmar Beiersdorfer (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-11-16 | ||||
Holger Ballwanz (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-09-07 | ||||
Henning Hardt (until 1992-06-30) | 1971-05-10 | ||||
3 | Stefan Schnoor (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-04-18 | |||
4 | Carsten Kober (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-10-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jorg Bode (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-08-22 | ||||
Thomas von Heesen (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-10-01 | ||||
Armin Eck (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-12-08 | ||||
Waldemar Matysik (until 1993-06-30) | 1961-09-27 | ||||
Detlev Dammeier (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | ||||
Jens Bochert (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-12-15 | ||||
6 | Jurgen Hartmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-10-27 | |||
21 | Harald Sporl (until 2000-12-06) | 1966-10-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Jan Furtok (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-03-09 | ||||
Emerson (until 1993-06-30) | 1973-07-28 | ||||
Uwe Eckel (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-07-06 | ||||
Herbert Waas (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-09-08 | ||||
Nando (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-07-03 | ||||
Ryszard Cyron (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-02-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1991-08-17 20:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |