Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erich Rutemoller (from 1992-03-07) (until 1992-12-31) | 1945-02-08 | ||||
Uwe Reinders (until 1992-03-06) | 1955-01-19 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Decker (until 1993-06-30) | 1949-03-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Daniel Hoffmann (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-10-27 | ||||
Jens Kunath (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-02-15 | ||||
Thomas Kohler (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-06-17 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gernot Alms (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-10-07 | ||||
Heiko Marz (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-07-09 | ||||
Mike Werner (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-02-13 | ||||
Frank Rillich (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-11-14 | ||||
Frantisek Straka (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-05-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jens Dowe (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-06-01 | ||||
Juri Schlunz (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-07-27 | ||||
Hilmar Weilandt (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-09-29 | ||||
Axel Schulz (until 1993-06-30) | 1959-05-20 | ||||
Jens Wahl (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-07-24 | ||||
Sven Oldenburg (until 1993-06-30) | 1973-03-31 | ||||
Stefan Boger (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-06-01 | ||||
Thomas Lassig (until 1992-06-30) | 1971-11-25 | ||||
Niels Schlotterbeck (from 1992-01-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-03-12 | ||||
Michael Spies (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-07-09 | ||||
Andreas Babendererde (until 1991-12-31) | 1962-07-22 | ||||
Oldrich Machala (until 1991-12-31) | 1963-08-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Stefan Persigehl (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-01-31 | ||||
Olaf Bodden (until 1994-10-04) | 1968-05-04 | ||||
Thomas Reif (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-08-13 | ||||
Harald Kramer (until 1992-12-31) | 1964-02-13 | ||||
Roman Sedlacek (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-01-12 | ||||
Florian Weichert (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-01-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1991-08-17 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1991-09-04 19:30 |
5 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |