Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1993-12-13) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Kurth (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-03-15 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Roman Geschlecht (until 1996-06-30) | 1961-12-28 | ||||
Frank Kontny (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-12-21 | ||||
Ingo Pickenacker (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-04-07 | ||||
Thomas Ridder (until 1993-06-30) | 1972-12-13 | ||||
Frank Thommessen (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-05-31 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Harald Kugler (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-02-15 | ||||
Jorg Lipinski (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-10-31 | ||||
Jurgen Margref (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-01-06 | ||||
Thomas Zdebel (until 1992-06-30) | 1973-05-25 | ||||
Stefan Chmielewski (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-01-21 | ||||
Jurgen Serr (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-05-21 | ||||
Vlatko Glavas (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-09-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Daouda Bangoura (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-04-29 | ||||
Oliver Grein (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-09-03 | ||||
Uwe Erlebach (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-02-26 | ||||
Uli Romp (until 1992-06-30) | |||||
Leo Maric (until 1992-06-30) | 1974-04-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1991-08-18 15:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |