Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hannes Bongartz (until 1994-03-03) | 1951-10-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Eilenberger (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-11-16 | ||||
Udo Mai (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-07-29 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans-Werner Moser (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-09-24 | ||||
Uwe Neuhaus (until 1995-06-30) | 1959-11-26 | ||||
Stefan Emmerling (until 1994-12-31) | 1966-02-10 | ||||
Jorg Bach (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-11-20 | ||||
Roger Prinzen (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-03-04 | ||||
Andrij Sydelnykow (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-09-27 | ||||
Dirk Greiser (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-02-24 | ||||
Thomas Langbein (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-01-31 | ||||
Jorg Sobiech (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-01-15 | ||||
Stefan Kuhn (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-12-29 | ||||
Thomas Siewert (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-11-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eduard Buckmaier (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-06-09 | ||||
Thorsten Fink (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-10-29 | ||||
Frank Hartmann (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-09-27 | ||||
Markus Schupp (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-01-07 | ||||
Heinz Vossen (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-07-08 | ||||
Andreas Hill (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-10-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Souleyman Sane (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-02-26 | ||||
Ali Ibrahim (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-01 | ||||
Uwe Tschiskale (until 1993-09-30) | 1962-07-09 | ||||
Andreas Muller (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-12-11 | ||||
Bernhard Winkler (from 1992-01-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-06-24 | ||||
Rene Unglaube (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-11-06 | ||||
Robert Trenner (until 1992-06-30) | 1973-01-20 | ||||
Srdjan Jankovic (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-02-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1991-08-16 20:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |