Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Holger Osieck (until 1992-11-02) | 1948-08-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 1995-06-30) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Andreas Wessels (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-07-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rob Reekers (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Olaf Dressel (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-09-19 | ||||
Thomas Kempe (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-03-17 | ||||
Peter Zanter (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-11-11 | ||||
Patrick Guillou (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-04-16 | ||||
Antonio Cabo (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-10-19 | ||||
12 | Christian Herrmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-01-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Wegmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-01-14 | ||||
Jorg Schwanke (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-01-12 | ||||
Dirk Eitzert (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-11-01 | ||||
Frank Heinemann (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-01-08 | ||||
Dirk Helmig (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-05-03 | ||||
Frank Benatelli (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-08-19 | ||||
Michael Rzehaczek (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-01-17 | ||||
Heiko Bonan (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-02-10 | ||||
Dariusz Wosz (from 1992-01-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-06-08 | ||||
Thorsten Schmugge (until 1992-06-30) | 1971-10-13 | ||||
Dirk Kontny (until 1991-10-31) | 1965-11-30 | ||||
6 | Peter Peschel (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Rocco Milde (until 1993-11-30) | 1969-06-08 | ||||
Frank Turr (until 1992-12-31) | 1970-09-16 | ||||
Ivo Knoflicek (from 1991-10-11) (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-02-23 | ||||
Thomas Epp (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-04-07 | ||||
Michael Klauss (until 1991-10-05) | 1970-09-15 | ||||
Jupp Nehl (until 1991-09-30) | 1961-06-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1991-08-17 15:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |