Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willi Entenmann (until 1993-11-09) | 1943-09-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Kopke (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-03-12 | ||||
Kurt Kowarz (until 1994-06-30) | 1958-04-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rainer Zietsch (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-11-21 | ||||
Kay Friedmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-05-15 | ||||
Markus Brand (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-09-19 | ||||
Marco Kurz (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-05-16 | ||||
Frank Schmidt (until 1994-06-30) | 1974-01-03 | ||||
Jorg Dittwar (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-08-01 | ||||
Uwe Wolf (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-10 | ||||
3 | Thomas Brunner (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-08-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Kramny (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-10-18 | ||||
Sergio Bustos (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-12-20 | ||||
Sascha Licht (until 1994-06-30) | 1974-09-27 | ||||
Hans Dorfner (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-07-03 | ||||
Manfred Schwabl (from 1993-01-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Marc Oechler (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-02-11 | ||||
Reinhold Hintermaier (until 1993-06-30) | 1956-02-14 | ||||
Markus Baurle (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-10-15 | ||||
Dirk Fengler (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-03-03 | ||||
Percy Olivares (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-06-05 | ||||
Thomas Seitz (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-07-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Christian Wuck (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-06-09 | ||||
Dieter Eckstein (until 1993-09-05) | 1964-03-12 | ||||
Uwe Rosler (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-11-15 | ||||
Roger Diebel (until 1993-06-30) | 1973-08-11 | ||||
Thomas Weissenberger (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-05-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1992-08-18 18:00 |
1 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1992-09-12 15:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1992-10-09 20:00 |
5 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1992-11-06 20:00 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1992-12-01 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |