Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erich Ribbeck (until 1993-12-27) | 1937-06-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Klaus Augenthaler (until 1997-06-30) | 1957-09-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Gospodarek (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-08-06 | ||||
Raimond Aumann (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-10-12 | ||||
Sven Scheuer (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-01-19 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jorginho (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-08-17 | ||||
Markus Munch (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-09-07 | ||||
Alois Reinhardt (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-11-18 | ||||
Roland Grahammer (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-11-03 | ||||
Thomas Berthold (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-11-12 | ||||
Oliver Kreuzer (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-11-13 | ||||
Thomas Helmer (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-04-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Sternkopf (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-04-21 | ||||
Christian Ziege (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-02-01 | ||||
Markus Schupp (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-01-07 | ||||
Wolfgang Gerstmeier (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-10-11 | ||||
Jan Wouters (until 1993-12-31) | 1960-07-17 | ||||
Olaf Thon (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-05-01 | ||||
Harald Cerny (until 1993-06-30) | 1973-09-13 | ||||
Andreas Mayer (until 1993-06-30) | 1972-09-13 | ||||
Lothar Matthaus (until 1993-06-30) | 1961-03-21 | ||||
Dieter Frey (until 1993-06-30) | 1972-10-31 | ||||
Christian Nerlinger (until 1993-06-30) | 1973-03-21 | ||||
Mehmet Scholl (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-10-16 | ||||
Manfred Schwabl (until 1992-12-31) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bruno Labbadia (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Mazinho (until 1993-12-31) | 1965-12-26 | ||||
Roland Wohlfarth (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-01-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1992-08-25 17:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1992-09-12 20:15 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |