Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans Meyer (until 1993-06-09) | 1942-11-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Christoph Franke (until 1996-05-14) | 1944-12-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jens Schmidt (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-04-03 | ||||
Holger Hiemann (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-01-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Torsten Bittermann (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-02-03 | ||||
Jorg Illing (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-10-02 | ||||
Jan Seifert (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-10-14 | ||||
Dirk Barsikow (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-10-01 | ||||
3 | Thomas Laudeley (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-11-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Lutz Wienhold (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-09-15 | ||||
Mario Neuhauser (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-11-08 | ||||
Heiko Gerber (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-07-11 | ||||
Olaf Renn (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-10-12 | ||||
Sixten Veit (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-01-07 | ||||
Ulf Mehlhorn (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-06-21 | ||||
Peter Keller (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-06-22 | ||||
Steffen Heidrich (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-07-19 | ||||
Jens Haustein (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-10-27 | ||||
Thomas Schweizer (from 1992-08-15) (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-09-13 | ||||
5 | Sven Kohler (until 1995-12-30) | 1966-02-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Steven Zweigler (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-11-26 | ||||
Frank Seifert (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-10-02 | ||||
Ojokojo Torunarigha (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-03-12 | ||||
Danilo Kunze (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-06-29 | ||||
Thorsten Boer (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-08-12 | ||||
Dirk Vollmar (until 1993-06-30) | 1972-04-04 | ||||
Boris Lucic (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-03-07 | ||||
Arnd Spranger (until 1992-12-31) | 1969-09-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1992-09-12 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1992-10-10 14:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1992-11-07 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1992-12-01 19:30 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1993-03-31 20:15 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |