Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dietmar Schacht (from 1993-03-26) (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-09-28 | ||||
Detlef Pirsig (until 1993-03-25) | 1945-10-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andre Stocki (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-03-31 | ||||
Thomas Feldhoff (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-08-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Viktor Bridaitis (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-05-18 | ||||
Sigitas Jakubauskas (until 1999-06-30) | 1958-12-29 | ||||
Martin Schiermoch (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-12-23 | ||||
Zdenko Kosanovic (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-05-13 | ||||
Achim Hausen (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-08-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Peter Gemein (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-09-14 | ||||
Martin Tilner (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-02-01 | ||||
Dirk Flock (until 1993-06-30) | 1972-05-23 | ||||
Michael Griehsbach (until 1993-06-30) | 1961-09-28 | ||||
Carsten Propper (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-10-20 | ||||
Ingmar Putz (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-01-31 | ||||
Pietro Callea (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-09-04 | ||||
Thomas Vtic (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-09-02 | ||||
Isaac Otoo (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-12-20 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Schmidt (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-03-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Heikko Glode (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-07-12 | ||||
Roman Sedlacek (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-01-12 | ||||
Oliver Ebersbach (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-07-10 | ||||
Thomas Boakye (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-09-23 | ||||
Andre Kroning (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-10-23 | ||||
Oliver Sturm (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-03-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1992-09-12 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1992-10-09 20:00 |
5 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |