Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ewald Lienen (from 1993-03-23) (until 1994-11-01) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Uwe Reinders (until 1993-03-23) | 1955-01-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jurgen Rollmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-10-17 | ||||
Ralf Kellermann (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-09-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Patrick Notthoff (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-02-26 | ||||
Michael Struckmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Andreas Gielchen (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-10-27 | ||||
Olaf Becker (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-11-21 | ||||
2 | Joachim Hopp (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-07-10 | |||
5 | Alfred Nijhuis (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-03-23 | |||
6 | Oliver Westerbeek (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Franz-Josef Steininger (until 1996-06-30) | 1960-07-09 | ||||
Rachid Azzouzi (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-01-10 | ||||
Stefan Boger (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-06-01 | ||||
Michael Tarnat (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-10-27 | ||||
Hannes Reinmayr (from 1993-01-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-08-23 | ||||
Manfred Tebeck (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-11-17 | ||||
Roland Seitz (until 1993-12-31) | 1964-10-01 | ||||
Stefan Minkwitz (until 1993-08-31) | 1968-06-01 | ||||
Michael Harforth (until 1993-06-30) | 1959-02-09 | ||||
Jaroslaw Araszkiewicz (from 1993-01-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-02-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Michael Preetz (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | ||||
Vlado Papic (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-09-21 | ||||
Ferenc Schmidt (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-07-28 | ||||
Jurgen Wegmann (from 1993-01-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-03-31 | ||||
Markus Sailer (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-04-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1992-09-11 19:30 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1992-10-10 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1992-11-06 19:30 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |