Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Ehrmantraut (until 1996-04-18) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Stefan Hulswitt (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-08-13 | ||||
Manfred Kubik (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-02-25 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Helmer (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-02-25 | ||||
Frank Faltin (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-11-22 | ||||
Bernd Deters (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-08-18 | ||||
Branko Dragutinovic (until 1993-06-30) | 1961-09-08 | ||||
22 | Eckhard Vorholt (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-10-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Manfred Schulte (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-09-26 | ||||
Carsten Marell (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-08 | ||||
Thomas Bottche (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-02-14 | ||||
Hans Jorg Bruckner (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-07-31 | ||||
Peter Gartmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-08-30 | ||||
Bogdan Dlugajczyk (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-05-03 | ||||
Martin Zimmer (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-03-08 | ||||
Gerd Heuermann (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-12-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Damir Bujan (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-03-29 | ||||
Robert Thoben (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-11-17 | ||||
Josef Menke (until 1997-06-30) | 1959-09-03 | ||||
Rainer Rauffmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-02-26 | ||||
Martin van der Putten (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-10-27 | ||||
Hendryk Lau (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-09-05 | ||||
Rustam Sabirow (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-10-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1992-09-11 20:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1992-10-11 15:00 |
2 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |